Coscarelli v. Saul
Plaintiff: Teri Jan Coscarelli
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01219
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teri Jan Coscarelli. All Defendants served 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019 (Zendeh Del, Jason)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. IT WAS DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR*** re #6 Order. (rf)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY -IT WAS ENTERED IN THE WRONG CASE***ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mgr).
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul and U.S. Attorney General (bc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Teri Jan Coscarelli. for U.S. Atty General and Andrew Saul c/o OGC (Zendeh Del, Jason)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Teri Jan Coscarelli. (Zendeh Del, Jason)
October 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12718979). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Teri Jan Coscarelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zendeh Del, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coscarelli v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Jan Coscarelli
Represented By: Jason Aaron Zendeh Del
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?