A & A Concepts, LLC, et al v. Lonestar Produce Express, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: A & A Concepts, LLC and Willson Davis Company
Defendant: Eric Fernandez, Lonestar Produce Express, LLC, Leonidez Fernandez III and Leonidez Fernandez, III
Case Number: 5:2019cv01223
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Release of Funds by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in light of Dkt. # 28 Notice of Agreement for Preliminary Injunction. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ar)
November 19, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE PLAINTIFFS HAVE BEEN ADDED AS FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT***re #28 Notice (Other). (rf)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING REGARDINGMOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Agreement for Preliminary Injunction by Eric Fernandez, Leonidez Fernandez, III, Lonestar Produce Express, LLC, A&A Concepts, LLC, Wilson Davis Company (Reed, Ryan) Modified on 11/19/2019, to add filers (rf).
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maurleen Worley Cobb on behalf of A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Attorney Maurleen Worley Cobb added to party A & A Concepts, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maurleen Worley Cobb added to party Willson Davis Company(pty:pla) (Cobb, Maurleen)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER In the interest of justice, the Court will again ORDER Defendantsto file a response as to Defendants position on the Motion for PreliminaryInjunction within five days of the date of this Order, otherwise the Motion maybe granted as unopposed. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 25 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Ryan C. Reed added to party Eric Fernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan C. Reed added to party Leonidez Fernandez, III(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan C. Reed added to party Lonestar Produce Express, LLC(pty:dft) by Eric Fernandez, Leonidez Fernandez, III, Lonestar Produce Express, LLC.(Reed, Ryan)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RESETTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Reset Motion Hearing for #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Motion Hearing reset for 11/20/2019 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company re #15 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Motion Hearings,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service)(Stokes, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Eric Fernandez served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Leonidez Fernandez, III served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Lonestar Produce Express, LLC served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Eric Fernandez. (rg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Leonidez Fernandez, III. (rg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Bond by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Clerk's Receipt)(Stokes, Craig)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Eric Fernandez; Summons to Leonidez Fernandez)(Stokes, Craig)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANING #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Willson Davis Company, A & A Concepts, LLC. Set Motion Hearing for #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra) Defendants are hereby immediately ENJOINED and prohibited fromalienating, dissipating, paying over, or assigning any assets of LonestarProduce Express, LLC until the Court issues subsequent orders or untilDefendants pay Plaintiffs the total aggregate sum of $80,970.93. Plaintiffs must secure a bond of $5,000.00 to the Court within forty-eight (48) hours of the time Plaintiffs receive notice of the filing of this Order, otherwise the TRO will be dissolved. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Corrected Affidavit of Plaintiff A&A Concepts, LLC's Representative by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Stokes, Craig)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Corrected Affidavit of Plaintiff Willson Davis Company's Representative by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Stokes, Craig)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Lesly Jones on behalf of A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Attorney David Lesly Jones added to party A & A Concepts, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David Lesly Jones added to party Willson Davis Company(pty:pla) (Jones, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Craig Stokes This Declaration is not to be filed as a stand alone document. All pleadings filed must have the heading,case number, signature of attorney and title of document. Plase refile. re #7 Affidavit in Support, (rg)
October 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Lonestar Produce Express, LLC. (rg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company (Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit of A&A Concepts, LLC's Representative by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #10. AFFIDAVIT in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Willson Davis Company's Representative by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Stokes, Craig) Modified on 10/15/2019 (rg).
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support, filed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company, re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Willson Davis Company, Plaintiff A & A Concepts, LLC, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Willson Davis Company, Plaintiff A & A Concepts, LLC (Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. Summons to all Defendants (Stokes, Craig)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12721881), filed by A & A Concepts, LLC, Willson Davis Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A&A Concepts Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit B - Willson Davis Statement of Account, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A & A Concepts, LLC, et al v. Lonestar Produce Express, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & A Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Represented By: David Lesly Jones
Represented By: Maurleen Worley Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willson Davis Company
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Represented By: David Lesly Jones
Represented By: Maurleen Worley Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Fernandez
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonestar Produce Express, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonidez Fernandez III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonidez Fernandez, III
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?