Loandepot.com, LLC v. Lewis, et al
Plaintiff: LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC
Defendant: Shirley A. Lewis and Cornelius Lewis
Case Number: 5:2019cv01242
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by LoanDepot.com, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LoanDepot.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danner, R.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #4 MOTION TO DEPOSIT RELEASE OF LIEN IN REGISTRY OF COURT by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Catalano, Frank)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: MISSING PROPOSED ORDER. Please do not re-file the entire document, please only file the proposedorder by using the Attachment Event and link to the Motion re #4 MOTION TO DEPOSIT RELEASE OF LIEN IN REGISTRY OF COURT (mgr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cornelius Lewis, Shirley A. Lewis. (mgr)
October 18, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Catalano, Frank)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Catalano, Frank)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION TO DEPOSIT RELEASE OF LIEN IN REGISTRY OF COURT by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Catalano, Frank) Modified on 10/21/2019 (mgr).
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Catalano, Frank)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Catalano, Frank)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12744697), filed by LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Catalano, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loandepot.com, LLC v. Lewis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC
Represented By: R. Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Frank J. Catalano
Represented By: Murad Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley A. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?