Sanchez et al v. Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas
Plaintiff: Cruz Sanchez
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas
Intervenor: Cielo Hills LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01248
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26 Report by Cruz Sanchez. (Roman, Ricardo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTED re #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report filed by Cielo Hills LLC, Cruz Sanchez, Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas, The Court hereby VACATES the Order Setting Status Conference and Hearing on All Pending Motions for that date (docket no. 12). That status conference and hearing on all pending motions, Hearing is Reset ( Status Conference & Pending Motions Re-set for 2/13/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of 2019-2020 Vacations of Charles A. Riley by Cielo Hills LLC (Riley, Charles)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***ORDER IS VACATED PER COURT ORDER, DOC#14 ***ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDINGMOTIONS, ( Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) Modified on 11/25/2019 (wg).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 7/9/2020,, Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2020,, Discovery due by 7/6/2020,, Joinder of Parties due by 3/9/2020,, Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2020,, Bench Trial set for 11/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT: Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Rule 26(f) Report to #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Cielo Hills LLC. (Riley, Charles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 ****DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - PROPOSED ORDER IS REQUIRED***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Cielo Hills LLC. (Riley, Charles) Modified on 11/20/2019, to add filers and to designate deficiency (rf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Recommendations by Cielo Hills LLC. (Riley, Charles)
November 20, 2019 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT -Proposed order required. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the (Attachment) event from menu and link the proposed order to the motion. See page 10, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas.*** re #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. (rf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cruz Sanchez. (Roman, Ricardo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Roland Gonzales and Javier Duran are withdrawn as attorneys of record for Defendant San Antonio Housing Authority. N. Mark Ralls, James Leech, and Harrison Fisher are hereby substituted as attorneys of record. Order entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (arb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Roland F. Gonzales and Javier T. Duran by Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)(Gonzales, Roland)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas. (Gonzales, Roland)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cielo Hills LLC. (Riley, Charles)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/20/2019,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas. (Gonzales, Roland)
October 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 21, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12752278), filed by Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Exh. A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Exh. A to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Exh. A to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Exh. A to Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duran, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz Sanchez
Represented By: Ricardo Aldelmo Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cielo Hills LLC
Represented By: Charles Anthony Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio, Texas
Represented By: Javier T. Duran
Represented By: Harrison Clark Fisher
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Represented By: James Johnston Leech, Jr.
Represented By: Roland F. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?