Rios v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Katherine Rios
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01266
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Stacy, Tiffany)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 1/23/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2020, Discovery due by 7/24/2020, Motions due by 8/20/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations Joint Scheduling Recommendations by Katherine Rios. (Galo, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations the parties shall submit a proposedscheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Stacy, Tiffany)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Katherine Rios. (Galo, Michael)
October 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
October 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pilot Travel Centers LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12772156), filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to JS-44, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Stacy, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Represented By: Tiffany Cox Stacy
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Rios
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?