Daniels et al v. AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lance Kozen, Shane Vinales, Barbara High-Daniels, Allison Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Becky Vinales, Jonathan Kline, Rachel Hiatt, Kassandra Wolf, Mark Hiatt, Sarah Kline, Samuel Hamilton, Jon Alexander, Leilani Hamilton, Megan Kozen, Thomas Wolf, Mary E. Pisano, Abigail Pisano, Anna Pisano and Carmen Pisano
Defendant: AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD and AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01280
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and, Subject Thereto, Motion to Abate MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Defendant AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, Defendant AETC II Property Managers, LLC in Support of Motion to Abate (Skipper, Jennifer)
December 24, 2019 Filing 22 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Allison Alexander, Jon Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Leilani Hamilton, Samuel Hamilton, Mark Hiatt, Rachel Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Jonathan Kline, Sarah Kline, Lance Kozen, Megan Kozen, Abigail Pisano, Anna Pisano, Carmen Pisano, Mary E. Pisano, Becky Vinales, Shane Vinales, Kassandra Wolf, Thomas Wolf, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and, Subject Thereto, Motion to Abate MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Defendant AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, Defendant AETC II Property Managers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cession Deed, #2 Exhibit Assumed Name Certificate)(Reed, Ryan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD, re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Kassandra Wolf, Plaintiff Sarah Kline, Plaintiff Abigail Pisano, Plaintiff Allison Alexander, Plaintiff Becky Vinales, Plaintiff Leilani Hamilton, Plaintiff Mark Hiatt, Plaintiff Lance Kozen, Plaintiff Megan Kozen, Plaintiff Carmen Pisano, Plaintiff Jon Alexander, Plaintiff Shane Vinales, Plaintiff Thomas Wolf, Plaintiff Anna Pisano, Plaintiff Jonathan Kline, Plaintiff Michael J Daniels, Plaintiff Rachel Hiatt, Plaintiff Samuel Hamilton, Plaintiff Barbara High-Daniels, Plaintiff Mary E. Pisano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Radliff Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-A - Guide to Historic Housing Brochure, #3 Exhibit 1-B - Preventative Maintenance Annual PM COM, #4 Exhibit 1-C - Move-In Move-Out Unit Inspection Inventory Report, #5 Exhibit 1-D - Leases & Addenda, #6 Exhibit 1-E - 2019.10.17.1458 - E-Mail, #7 Exhibit 1-F - 2019.12.12 Hiatt E-mail, #8 Exhibit 1-G - 2019.1.2 Pisano E-Mail, #9 Exhibit 1-H - 2019.3.28 Pisano E-Mail, #10 Exhibit 1-I - 2019.10.16 Terri Hefford Pisano E-Mail, #11 Exhibit 1-J - 2019.10.21 Pisano E-Mail, #12 Exhibit 1-K - Legal Letter - Pisano, #13 Exhibit 1-L - 2019.11.7 Lenderman Corresp, #14 Exhibit 2 - Stock Declaration, #15 Exhibit 2-A - CV, #16 Exhibit 2-B - EPA Publications)(Skipper, Jennifer)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Allison Alexander, Jon Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Leilani Hamilton, Samuel Hamilton, Mark Hiatt, Rachel Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Jonathan Kline, Sarah Kline, Lance Kozen, Megan Kozen, Abigail Pisano, Anna Pisano, Carmen Pisano, Mary E. Pisano, Becky Vinales, Shane Vinales, Kassandra Wolf, Thomas Wolf, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and, Subject Thereto, Motion to Abate MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Defendant AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, Defendant AETC II Property Managers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alexander, #2 Exhibit Daniels, #3 Exhibit Hamilton, #4 Exhibit Hiatt, #5 Exhibit Kline, #6 Exhibit Konzen, #7 Exhibit PIsano, #8 Exhibit Vinales, #9 Exhibit Wolf, #10 Exhibit Pearlson)(Reed, Ryan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Walter H. Boone for AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC,Walter H. Boone for AETC II Property Managers, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING FILING REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer J. Skipper on behalf of Walter H. Boone ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12958370) by on behalf of AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice)(Skipper, Jennifer)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and, Subject Thereto, Motion to Abate, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Mann, Julia)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2020 9:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants may respond to Plaintiffs Application for Preliminary Injunction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 on or before December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, Julia)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Allison Alexander, Jon Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Leilani Hamilton, Samuel Hamilton, Mark Hiatt, Rachel Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Jonathan Kline, Sarah Kline, Lance Kozen, Megan Kozen, Abigail Pisano, Anna Pisano, Carmen Pisano, Mary E. Pisano, Becky Vinales, Shane Vinales, Kassandra Wolf, Thomas Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Reed, Ryan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mann, Julia)
November 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Thomas Wolf, Mark Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Michael J Daniels, Megan Kozen, Jon Alexander, Sarah Kline, Shane Vinales, Samuel Hamilton, Kassandra Wolf, Allison Alexander, Lance Kozen, Rachel Hiatt, Becky Vinales, Leilani Hamilton, Jonathan Kline, Abigail Pisano, Anna Pisano, Carmen Pisano, Mary E. Pisano.(Reed, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines: Hunt ELP, LTD answer due 12/11/2019. (bc)
November 20, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines: AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC answer due 12/11/2019; AETC II Property Managers, LLC answer due 12/11/2019. (bc)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants may respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint (docket no. 1) and file their Rule 12(b) motion on or before December 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allison Alexander, Jon Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Leilani Hamilton, Samuel Hamilton, Mark Hiatt, Rachel Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Jonathan Kline, Sarah Kline, Lance Kozen, Megan Kozen, Becky Vinales, Shane Vinales, Kassandra Wolf, Thomas Wolf, re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and to File Rule 12(b) Motion filed by Defendant Hunt ELP, LTD, Defendant AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, Defendant AETC II Property Managers, LLC (Reed, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J. Skipper on behalf of AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD (Skipper, Jennifer)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and to File Rule 12(b) Motion by AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mann, Julia)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julia Wommack Mann on behalf of AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD. Attorney Julia Wommack Mann added to party AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Wommack Mann added to party AETC II Property Managers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Wommack Mann added to party Hunt ELP, LTD(pty:dft) (Mann, Julia)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC, AETC II Property Managers, LLC, and Hunt ELP, LTD. (bc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Allison Alexander, Jon Alexander, Michael J Daniels, Leilani Hamilton, Samuel Hamilton, Mark Hiatt, Rachel Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Jonathan Kline, Sarah Kline, Lance Kozen, Megan Kozen, Becky Vinales, Shane Vinales, Kassandra Wolf, Thomas Wolf. Plaintiffs (Reed, Ryan)
October 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12780977). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Thomas Wolf, Mark Hiatt, Barbara High-Daniels, Michael J Daniels, Megan Kozen, Jon Alexander, Sarah Kline, Shane Vinales, Samuel Hamilton, Kassandra Wolf, Allison Alexander, Lance Kozen, Rachel Hiatt, Becky Vinales, Leilani Hamilton, Jonathan Kline. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(Reed, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels et al v. AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Kozen
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Vinales
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara High-Daniels
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Alexander
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Daniels
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Vinales
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Kline
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hiatt
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassandra Wolf
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hiatt
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Kline
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Alexander
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Kozen
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wolf
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Represented By: James R. Moriarty
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Pisano
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Pisano
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Pisano
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Pisano
Represented By: Ryan C. Reed
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETC II Property Managers, LLC
Represented By: Walter H. Boone
Represented By: Jennifer J. Skipper
Represented By: Julia Wommack Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt ELP, LTD
Represented By: Walter H. Boone
Represented By: Jennifer J. Skipper
Represented By: Julia Wommack Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETC II Privatized Housing, LLC
Represented By: Walter H. Boone
Represented By: Jennifer J. Skipper
Represented By: Julia Wommack Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?