Justin Goldman v. Cox Media Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Defendant: Cox Media Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01283
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District, New York Division as case number 1:19-CV-10924. (rg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (rg)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. Southern District of New York by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(Calzada, Alicia)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Graf on behalf of Cox Media Group, LLC. Attorney Jennifer L. Graf added to party Cox Media Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Graf, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (rg)
October 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge. (rg)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12782779). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calzada, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justin Goldman v. Cox Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Represented By: Alicia Wagner Calzada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?