Ray v. The Villa Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David S. Ray
Defendant: ResortCom International, LLC, The Villa Group, Inc. and Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01295
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after any defendant has appeared. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Little, Brendan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Brendan Hoffman Little added to party Monterey Financial Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Monterey Financial Services, LLC.(Little, Brendan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Ray. ResortCom International, LLC served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Taylor, Alexander)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Ray. Monterey Financial Services, LLC served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Taylor, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Ray. The Villa Group, Inc. served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Taylor, Alexander)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David S. Ray. (Taylor, Alexander)
October 31, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander James Adducci Taylor on behalf of David S. Ray (Taylor, Alexander)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12795597), filed by David S. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. The Villa Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ResortCom International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Villa Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Ray
Represented By: Alexander James Adducci Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?