Cano v. Harlandale Independent School District
Plaintiff: Destiny Cano
Defendant: Harlandale Independent School District
Case Number: 5:2019cv01296
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: Recd. Notification and (1) CD of the Certified Administrative Record. Original Forwarded to the Court. (wg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Destiny Cano as to Harlandale Independent School District. Waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Cirkiel, Martin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Destiny Cano. (Cirkiel, Martin)
October 31, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12795602). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Destiny Cano.(Cirkiel, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cano v. Harlandale Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Cano
Represented By: Martin J. Cirkiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlandale Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?