Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lynette Garcia
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01307
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynette Garcia. Andrew Saul served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Olinsky, Howard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lynette Garcia. (Olinsky, Howard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wg)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Lynette Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wg)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lynette Garcia, The Plaintiffs Complaint [#1-1] shall be filed by theClerk without prepayment of fees, It is also Ordered that if not already accomplished, the Plaintiff shall submit Summons & USM/285's for service of process on Defts. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
November 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney.. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lynette Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Garcia
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?