United States of America v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gonzales County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector, Connie Y. Nance, Michael H. Thomas, Guadalupe County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector, Basic Energy Services, LP, United Built Homes, LLC, Margarita Thomas, Estate of Thomas S. Bryan, Estate of Walter Scott Voges, Karen L. Cooley, Railroad Commission of Texas and Estate of Peggy L. Hailey
Claimant: Gonzales County Fire District, Gonzales County, Texas, Nixon-Smiley Consolidated Independent School District, Gonzales County Emergency Services District, Nixon Hospital District and Gonzales County Water District
Case Number: 5:2019cv01389
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #13 Counterclaim by United States of America. (Adams, David)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Peter Boyd Wells, IV added to party Estate of Peggy L. Hailey(pty:dft) by Estate of Peggy L. Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wells, Peter)
January 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Estate of Peggy L. Hailey answer due 1/10/2020. (bc)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responsive pleading due on or before Jan. 10, 2020. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Michael H. Thomas. (bc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Estate of Peggy L. Hailey. (mgr)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties shall submit a proposedscheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (bc)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by Karen L. Cooley.(Izen, Joe)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Joe Alfred Izen, Jr added to party Karen L. Cooley(pty:dft) by Karen L. Cooley.(Izen, Joe)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Verified Claim of Gonzales County, Texas et al. by Gonzales County Emergency Services District, Gonzales County Fire District, Gonzales County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector, Gonzales County Water District, Gonzales County, Texas, Nixon Hospital District, Nixon-Smiley Consolidated Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bird, Douglas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gonzales County Emergency Services District, Gonzales County Fire District, Gonzales County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector, Gonzales County Water District, Gonzales County, Texas, Nixon Hospital District, Nixon-Smiley Consolidated Independent School District.(Bird, Douglas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Gonzales County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector, Gonzales County, Texas, Gonzales County Emergency Services District, Gonzales County Fire District, Gonzales County Water District, Nixon Hospital District, Nixon-Smiley Consolidated Independent School District. (Bird, Douglas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney C. Alan Gauldin added to party United Built Homes, LLC(pty:dft) by United Built Homes, LLC.(Gauldin, C.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Karen L. Cooley served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Estate of Peggy L. Hailey served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Estate of Thomas S. Bryan served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; Estate of Walter Scott Voges served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; Connie Y. Nance served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; Railroad Commission of Texas served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Margarita Thomas served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Michael H. Thomas served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; United Built Homes, LLC served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Adams, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Matthew Tepper added to party Guadalupe County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector(pty:dft) by Guadalupe County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector.(Tepper, Matthew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Basic Energy Services, LP served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Adams, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by United States of America. (Adams, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Adams, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, David) Modified on 11/27/2019, to edit text (rf).
November 27, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Y. Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe County Texas Tax Assessor-Collector
Represented By: Matthew Tepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Energy Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Built Homes, LLC
Represented By: C. Alan Gauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Thomas S. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Walter Scott Voges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Cooley
Represented By: Joe Alfred Izen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railroad Commission of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Peggy L. Hailey
Represented By: Peter Boyd Wells, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gonzales County Fire District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gonzales County, Texas
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nixon-Smiley Consolidated Independent School District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gonzales County Emergency Services District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nixon Hospital District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gonzales County Water District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?