Cruz v. Wells Fargo
Plaintiff: Jacqueline J Cruz
Defendant: Bank N.A. Wells Fargo and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01446
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 1, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Bank N.A. Wells Fargo answer due 1/3/2020. (mgr)
January 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended up to, and including, January 3, 2020. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank N.A. Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Bank N.A. Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Orde. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
December 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank N.A. Wells Fargo (Filing fee Received $400 Receipt #0542-12964617), filed by Bank N.A. Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B-Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Docket Sheet and State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit D-Bexar County Central Appraisal District Valuation for the Property)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank N.A. Wells Fargo . (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank N.A. Wells Fargo
Represented By: Brenda Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Brenda Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline J Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?