Annette S. Newton v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Annette S. Newton
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01448
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/25/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
December 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Summers, Monica)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12966705), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's original petition and application for injunctive relief, #3 Exhibit 2 - Citation request, #4 Exhibit 3 - Temporary restraining order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bank of America, N.A.'s answer, #6 Exhibit 5 - Docket sheet, #7 Exhibit 6 - Bexar County appraisal district information sheet, #8 Exhibit 7 - Civil cover sheet, #9 Exhibit 8 - Supplemental civil cover sheet)(Thomas, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annette S. Newton v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew D. Thomas
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette S. Newton
Represented By: Jason LeBoeuf
Represented By: Robert C. Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?