United States of America v. $5,000.00 More or Less, In United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency
Claimant: Robert Rodriguez
Case Number: 5:2019cv01464
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Notice of Correction: to attorney Shawn Brown***WHEN ADDING A NEW PARTY (CLAIMANT) TO A COMPLAINT IT MUST BE FILED IN THE TRADITIONAL MANNER***re #5 Answer to Complaint. (rg)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint for Forfeiture by $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency. (Brown, Shawn)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Shawn C. Brown added to party $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency(pty:res) by $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Shawn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 FORFEITURE ORDER Returned Executed on $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency on 02/05/2020. (mo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest of Property (rf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR WARRANT OF ARREST OF PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
December 18, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
December 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Notice, #2 Warrant, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A)(Franco, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $5,000.00 More or Less, In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Antonio Franco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: $5,000.00, More or Less, In United States Currency
Represented By: Shawn C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Shawn C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?