Pilgrim REO, LLC; et al. v. Merkle; et al.
Plaintiff: Pilgrim REO, LLC
Defendant: Janie J. Merkle
Counter Defendant: Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC
Intervenor: Carl N. Merkle
Case Number: 5:2019mc00740
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Carl N. Merkle, re #1 MOTION Emergency Motion to Withdraw the Reference in Bankruptcy Case 19-05028-CAG Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) filed by Intervenor Carl N. Merkle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 01 - Attachment 2 - Final Signed Escrow Statement - Unlawful debt collection, #2 Exhibit Ex 02 - Stolen Hazard Insurance Check 20150618 $104,767_38, #3 Exhibit Ex 03 - Attachment 4 - Executive Summary Charts - Merkle's accounting, #4 Exhibit Ex 04 - D-Ex 24 Debtor Calculation of Loan Payoff Based on Dates of Payments, #5 Exhibit Ex 05 - D-Ex 28 Correspondence between Merkle and CCSC, #6 Exhibit Ex 06 - was 19-790 Ex B - Transcript 20190605, #7 Exhibit Ex 07 - Paragraph by Paragraph Analysis of Response, #8 Exhibit Ex 08 - Complete Section II, #9 Exhibit Ex 09 - Complete Section III - not used, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 - Complete Section IV, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 - Complete Section V - not used, see Ex 7, #12 Exhibit Ex 12 - Complete Section VI - not used, see Ex 7, #13 Exhibit Ex 13 - Complete Section VII, #14 Exhibit Ex 14 - Complete Section VIII, #15 Exhibit Ex 15 - 1080B - Understanding The Fraudster, #16 Exhibit Ex 16 - Donald Cressey's Criminologist Article -1965-05 The Respectable Criminal, #17 Exhibit Ex 17 - Fighting Fraud In the Government_Introduction Chapter, #18 Exhibit Ex 18 - 9051D - Ethics for California CPAs, #19 Exhibit Ex 19 - Ethical Hedonism, #20 Exhibit Ex 20 - Some Personality Correlates of Business WhiteCollar Crime, #21 Exhibit Ex 21 - Research Article_05_Fraud_Triangle_Theory_and_Fraud_Diamond_Theory - Copy, #22 Exhibit Ex 22 - Case Cite - In re Gilbreath - proof of claims that fail to comply w BK rules invalid, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Supplemental Order BK to RIO 2 WD Ref 19-050128)(Merkle, Carl)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to respond to Dockets 4 and 5 is extended to July 31, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Attachment, #4 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Carl N. Merkle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Merkle, Carl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Disclosure Disclosing Entire State Case Docket by Carl N. Merkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX01 20190702 2016ci13558 Case Docket as of 7-2-2019, #2 Exhibit EX02 P00001 2016-08-12 Plaintiffs Original Petition, #3 Exhibit EX03 P00002 2016-08-12 Service assigned to clerk 3, #4 Exhibit EX04 P00003 2016-08-12 Request for service and Process, #5 Exhibit EX05 P00004 2017-11-02 Certificate of Secty of State - Janie Merkle, #6 Exhibit EX06 P00005 2016-11-04 Original Answer of Janie Merkle and Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit EX07 P00006 2016-11-04 Jury Demand Jury Fee Paid, #8 Exhibit EX08 P00007 2017-01-19 Change of Address for J Reese and B Gordon, #9 Exhibit EX09 P00010 2017-02-09 Mtn to Set Trial Before Jury, #10 Exhibit EX10 P00011 2017-02-09 Order Setting Hearing, #11 Exhibit EX11 P00012 2017-05-04 Service Assigned to Clerk 2, #12 Exhibit EX12 P00013 2017-05-04 Merkle's Pro Se Plea in Intervention, #13 Exhibit EX13 P00014 2017-05-04 Request For Service and Process, #14 Exhibit EX14 P00015 2017-05-30 Case closed, Change of Venue Transfer BK Court, #15 Exhibit EX15 P00016 2017-05-30 Notice of Removal to BK Ct, #16 Exhibit EX16 P00017 2017-05-31 Notice of Jury Trial Setting, #17 Exhibit EX17 P00018 2017-06-06 Notice of Jury Trial Setting Returned by mail for C Merkle, wrong address, #18 Exhibit EX18 P00019 2017-10-11 Copy of Order of Remand, #19 Exhibit EX19 P00020 2017-10-11 Reinstatement, case remanded back to state, #20 Exhibit EX20 P00021 2017-10-13 Notice of filing of BK Ct Order dismissing Interv claims w-prej, #21 Exhibit EX21 P00023 2017-10-13 Non Suit Without Prejudice, #22 Exhibit EX22 P00024 2017-10-20 1) Mtn to reinstate, 2) notification of removal, 3) jury demand, #23 Exhibit EX23 P00025 2017-10-24 Notice of Change of Address - Carl Merkle, #24 Exhibit EX24 P00026 2017-10-20 Certified Copy filed of order of remand, #25 Exhibit EX25 P00027 2017-10-20 Certified Copy filed of notice of appeal and stmt of election, #26 Exhibit EX26 P00028 2017-10-20 Certified Copy filed of USDC West Dist of Tx Civil Dkt Sheet, #27 Exhibit EX27 P00029 2018-07-24 Notice of Filing of USDCs Order, USDC lacks subject matter jurisd, #28 Exhibit EX28 P00030 2019-02-04 Notice of Filing Advisory 1, #29 Exhibit EX29 P00031 2019-02-12 Exhibits to Advisory 2, #30 Exhibit EX30 P00032 2019-02-12 Notice of Filing Advisory 2, #31 Exhibit EX31 P00033 2019-02-14 Notice of Filing Advisory 3, #32 Exhibit EX32 P00034 2019-02-19 Notice of Filing Reply to RIO Advisory 1, #33 Exhibit EX33 P00035 2019-02-21 Notice of Filing in USDC, Mtn to Perm Trsfr Case BK to 18-588, #34 Exhibit EX34 P00036 2019-03-08 Notice of a Filing in USDC RE Mtn to Trsfr Case, #35 Exhibit EX35 P00037 2019-03-26 Notice of Filing Advisory 4, #36 Exhibit EX36 P00038 2019-04-30 Mtn to Start up litigation at level 3 discovery, involves claim 6-3, #37 Exhibit EX37 P00039 2019-05-13 Notice of Filing Jury Demand in USDC case 18-588, #38 Exhibit EX38 P00040 2019-05-16 Request for CD from Steve Pluck, #39 Exhibit EX39 P00041 2019-05-28 Case Closed Change of Venue Transfer, moved to BK Court, #40 Exhibit EX40 P00042 2019-05-42 Notice of Removal to BK Ct for West D of Tx, #41 Exhibit EX41 P00043 2016-06-05 Request for CD from Carl Merkle, #42 Exhibit EX42 S00001 to S0005 Service)(Merkle, Carl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing - Response in Opposition to #1 MOTION Emergency Motion to Withdraw the Reference in Bankruptcy Case 19-05028-CAG Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) (Attachments: #1 Response in Opposition, #2 Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Pilgrim REO, LLC, re #1 MOTION Emergency Motion to Withdraw the Reference in Bankruptcy Case 19-05028-CAG Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) filed by Intervenor Carl N. Merkle (Wilson, Natalie)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Carl N. Merkle. (aej)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION Emergency Motion to Withdraw the Reference in Bankruptcy Case 19-05028-CAG Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) filed by Carl N. Merkle. Signed by Judge Craig A. Gargotta. (aej)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency Motion to Withdraw the Reference in Bankruptcy Case 19-05028-CAG Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) by Carl N. Merkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
June 24, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)
June 24, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim REO, LLC; et al. v. Merkle; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie J. Merkle
Represented By: Patrick H. Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilgrim REO, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Friend Wilson
Represented By: David S. Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carl N. Merkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?