El Campo Ventures, LLC v. Stratton Securities, Inc,. et al
Plaintiff: El Campo Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Clay Signor, Signor Logistics, LLC, Daniel Stratton, Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Stratton Securities, Inc,., Shannon Stratton and Stratton Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00469
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE WDTX/AUSTIN DIVISION, This case is related to the case filed 1:20-cv-248-RP in the Austin Division of this Court and assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Join Transfer of Venue by Clay Signor, Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Signor Logistics, LLC. (Farrar, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton, Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc., re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Stratton Securities, Inc., Defendant Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC (Jones, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Clay Signor, Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Signor Logistics, LLC, Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton, Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc., re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff El Campo Ventures, LLC (Jones, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Clay Signor, Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Signor Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworn Declaration of Clay Signor)(Farrar, William)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/14/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2020, Discovery due by 12/31/2020, Motions due by 1/29/2021,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by El Campo Ventures, LLC, re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Stratton Securities, Inc., Defendant Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC (Nevarez, Alfonso)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Miscellaneous Objection to #8 Proposed Pretrial Order by Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton, Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Pretrial Order by El Campo Ventures, LLC. (Nevarez, Alfonso)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by El Campo Ventures, LLC, re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Stratton Securities, Inc., Defendant Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC (Nevarez, Alfonso) Modified on 5/18/2020, to edit text (mgr).
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton.(Jones, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Atty: Benjamin P. Gates. (wg)
April 15, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
April 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc,..(Jones, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc,.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Stratton)(Jones, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clay Signor, Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Signor Logistics, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc,., Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13459669), filed by Clay Signor, Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC, Signor Logistics, LLC, Stratton Securities, Inc,., Signor Farm and Ranch, LP, Daniel Stratton, Shannon Stratton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment A-1 (Plaintiffs' Original Petition), #3 Exhibit Attachment B (Notice of Remocal to be filed in State Court), #4 Exhibit Attachment C (Affidavit of Daniel Stratton), #5 Exhibit Attachment D (Declaration of Clay Signor), #6 Exhibit Attachment E (Consent to Removal from Signor Defendants), #7 Exhibit Attachment F (Consent to Removal from Defendants Daniel Stratton and Shannon Stratton), #8 Exhibit Attachment G (Disclosure Statement))(Jones, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Campo Ventures, LLC v. Stratton Securities, Inc,. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Campo Ventures, LLC
Represented By: George L. Salinas, Jr.
Represented By: Alfonso C. Nevarez
Represented By: Benjamin P. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton Oilfield Systems Texas, LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Signor
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Represented By: William D. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signor Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Represented By: William D. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Stratton
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signor Farm and Ranch, LP
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Represented By: William D. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton Securities, Inc,.
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Stratton
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?