Loewy Enterprises v. Buffets LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Loewy Enterprises dba Sunrise Produce Company and Loewy Enterprises doing business as Sunrise Produce Company
Defendant: Buffets LLC, FMP SA Management Group LLC, Allen Jones, Food Management Partners Inc., Alamo Ovation LLC, Larry Harris and Jason Kemp
Case Number: 5:2020cv00671
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED FACTS AND HOLDING CASE IN ABEYENCE PENDING DEFENDANTS' COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Further, it is ORDERED that this case shall be, and hereby is, held in abeyance untilDecember 31, 2020 pending Defendants making payments as contemplated by the Settlement Agreement and that Plaintiff may, upon a default in payment by Defendants, file a motion for entryof judgment against Defendants pursuant to the Settlement Agreement Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Facts and Order Holding Case in Abeyance Pending Defendants' Compliance with Settlement Agreement by Loewy Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Ribelin, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loewy Enterprises. Food Management Partners Inc. served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Ribelin, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loewy Enterprises. FMP SA Management Group LLC served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Ribelin, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loewy Enterprises. Alamo Ovation LLC served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Ribelin, Timothy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Food Management Partners Inc.. (mgr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Loewy Enterprises. (Butler, Lynn)
June 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (cd)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alamo Ovation LLC, Buffets LLC, FMP SA Management Group LLC, Food Management Partners Inc., Larry Harris, Allen Jones, Jason Kemp. (mgr)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
June 4, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Loewy Enterprises dba Sunrise Produce Company. (Butler, Lynn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Loewy Enterprises dba Sunrise Produce Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(Butler, Lynn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13632793), filed by Loewy Enterprises dba Sunrise Produce Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butler, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loewy Enterprises v. Buffets LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffets LLC
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMP SA Management Group LLC
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Jones
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Management Partners Inc.
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo Ovation LLC
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Harris
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kemp
Represented By: Neil R. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loewy Enterprises dba Sunrise Produce Company
Represented By: Lynn H. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loewy Enterprises doing business as Sunrise Produce Company
Represented By: Lynn H. Butler
Represented By: Timothy Paul Ribelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?