Cortez Velasquez v. Bible et al
Defendant: Warden Ray Castro, Matthew Albence, Daniel Bible, Chad Wolf and U.S. Atty General William Barr
Petitioner: Diego Geremias Cortez Velasquez
Case Number: 5:2020cv00674
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is this Courts policy to require all counsel to apply for admission to the Western Districts federal bar and to follow through with the application as a condition of appearance pro hac vice in any case. This Court, however, has made an exception for out-of-district counsel if their practice in the District is limited to one case and, in limited circumstances, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney is involved in the case as co-counsel. Here, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney has been designated as co-counsel. Therefore, counsel may appear in this case pro hac vice without seeking admission to practice in the Western District of Texas, although counsel is free to seekand is encouraged to seekadmission if that is desired. Any future appearance in the Western District of Texas will require that counsel apply for admission and be admitted into this District, unless otherwise ordered by the Court.Court further ORDERS that counsel must become familiar with the Local Court Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, a copy of which may be obtained from the United States District Clerk for the Western District of Texas or from the Courts website. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel appearing pro hac vice, pursuant to Section 6 of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases in the Western District of Texas, must register as a filing user within ten (10) days of this Order.Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diego Nunez Astorga (Filing fee $100.00 receipt number 500054971) by on behalf of Diego Geremias Cortez Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 copy of receipt) Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of Petitioner's Section 2254 complaint as to Ray Castro. (wg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of Petitioner's Section 2241 complaint as to Matthew Albence, William Barr, Daniel Bible, Chad Wolf. (rg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt(s) addressed to Faith Johnson Lowry and Ray Castro of #5 Order Directing Service for Answer, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (rg)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE - Respondents to file a response to the Petition within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of service.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk shall furnish the Office of theUnited States Attorney in San Antonio, Texas, with copies of the Petition and this Order, and that such delivery by certified mail return receipt requested shall constitute sufficient service of process on Respondents: William P. Barr, Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf and Daniel Bible. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk shall serve the remaining Respondent: Raymundo Castro by certified mail return receipt requested.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, William Barr, Daniel Bible, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cd)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ray Castro. (cd)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Diego Geremias Cortez Velasquez. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
June 4, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
June 4, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Correction: Case was filed by attorney in Austin but should have filed in the San Antonio Division - new case number is 5:20cv674. (kc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0542-13632159), filed by Diego Geremias Cortez Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Walker Gates, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez Velasquez v. Bible et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ray Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Atty General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diego Geremias Cortez Velasquez
Represented By: Jennifer Walker Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?