Yearwood v. San Antonio Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Mary Yearwood
Defendant: San Antonio Housing Authority
Case Number: 5:2020cv00709
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 San Antonio Housing Authority's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Attorney Roland F. Gonzales added to party San Antonio Housing Authority(pty:dft) by San Antonio Housing Authority.(Gonzales, Roland)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Yearwood as to San Antonio Housing Authority. Waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Fein, Cory)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to San Antonio Housing Authority. (wg)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to San Antonio Housing Authority. (cd)
June 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
June 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Yearwood. (Fein, Cory)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13672828), filed by Mary Yearwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fein, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yearwood v. San Antonio Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Housing Authority
Represented By: Roland F. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Yearwood
Represented By: Cory S. Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?