Mi Familia Vota et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Micaela Rodriguez, Mi Familia Vota and Guadalupe Torres
Defendant: Ruth Hughs and Greg Abbott
Not Classified By Court: Henry J. Bemporad
Case Number: 5:2020cv00830
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #44 by Mi Familia Vota, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-13959330) (Lyons, Sean)
September 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER--Defendants Motions to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction are GRANTED on this issue alone. Because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the Court will not reach or decide the 17 remaining substantive issues raised in Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Motion for Pre-liminary Injunction is DENIED as moot without reaching any substantive issues. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dermody, Kelly)
September 4, 2020 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #20 MOTION to Dismiss (bc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jason K. Pulliam: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2020 re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ruth Hughs, #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, #30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ruth Hughs, Greg Abbott, #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greg Abbott (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Tish Moncivais.)(bc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 41 ATTACHMENT [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Counsel Madeline M. Gomez to #38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Madeline M. Gomez by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Dermody, Kelly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 40 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE A PROPOSED ORDER AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** re #38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Madeline M. Gomez (bc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs, re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ruth Hughs, #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Greg Abbott (Sweeten, Patrick)
September 2, 2020 Filing 38 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Madeline M. Gomez by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Dermody, Kelly) Modified on 9/3/2020 To edit text (bc).
September 1, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric A. Hudson on behalf of Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. Attorney Eric A. Hudson added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Eric A. Hudson added to party Ruth Hughs(pty:dft) (Hudson, Eric)
September 1, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Ruth Hughs(pty:dft) (Thompson, William)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher added to party Ruth Hughs(pty:dft) (Disher, Todd)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing for #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss ( Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 11:00 AM via video conference before Judge Jason K. Pulliam). Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres, re #30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Ruth Hughs, Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: #1 Dermody Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Did not Settle.(bc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Motion for Preliminary Injunction #29 entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [19,20] entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Mediation Conference held on 8/27/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(bc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Attachments: #1 Atkeson Declaration, #2 Dermody Declaration, #3 Martin Declaration, #4 Stein Declaration, #5 Torres Declaration, #6 Troisi Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly)
August 26, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres, re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ruth Hughs, #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: #1 MFV Declaration, #2 NAACP Declaration, #3 Rodriguez Declaration, #4 Torres Declaration)(Dermody, Kelly)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly)
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. (Sweeten, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER --Upon consideration, the parties are hereby ordered to file a joint advisory with this Court on or before Wednesday, August 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (Mediation Conference set VIA VIDEO USING THE ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE for 8/27/2020 1:45 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad) if not already done, Plaintiffs counsel is invited to submit a written settlement demand to Defendants counsel with a brief explanation of why such a settlement is appropriate, by noon on August 24, 2020. If Plaintiffs counselsubmits a demand, Defendants counsel must respond by submitting a written offer to Plaintiffs counsel, with a brief explanation of why such a settlement is appropriate, by 5:00 p.m. on August 26, 2020. If a settlement agreement is reached, the parties must notify the undersigned by 9:30 a.m. on August 27, 2020. If no settlement is reached, each party must submit to the undersigned, by 9:30 A.M. on August 27, 2020, an ex parte, in camera statement in letter format, setting forth the current status of settlement negotiations and the partys respective settlement position concerning all issues involved in the case, with a brief explanation of the rationale for the position taken.Do not file copies of the letters with the Clerk. The undersigned will review the statements in advance of the mediation conference, along with the pertinent pleadings in the case. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jason K. Pulliam: Status Conference/ Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2020 re #21 MOTION filed by Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) **MOTION #21 ORALLY GRANTED (Court Reporter Tish Moncivais.)(bc)
August 19, 2020 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE EVENT FROM STIPULATION TO MOTION*** re #21 MOTION. (bc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Modify Briefing Schedule re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Dermody, Kelly) Modified on 8/19/2020 To edit text (bc).
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Greg Abbott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruth Hughs. (Sweeten, Patrick)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER--Withdrawing 17 Order and Order Setting Status Conference By Video Conference ( Status Conference set for 8/19/2020 9:30 AM before Judge Jason K. Pulliam). Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Ruth Hughs served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Greg Abbott served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Courtney Hostetler may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Ronald Fein may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Ben Clemens may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, John Bonifaz may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Michael Sheen may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Yaman Salahi may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Avery Halfon may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Madeline Gomez may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. If the attorney appears in any other case in the Western District of Texas in the future, she must be admitted to practice in the district. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f). Accordingly, Kelly M. Dermody may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds the movant complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Accordingly, Evan Ballan may appear pro hac vice in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mk)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Courtney M. Hostetler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780860) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Ronald A. Fein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780848) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Ben Clements ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780838) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons John C. Bonifaz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780814) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Michael K. Sheen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780801) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Yaman Salahi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780797) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Avery S. Halfon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780789) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Madeline M. Gomez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780777) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Kelly M. Dermody ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780767) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarence V. Lyons Evan J. Ballan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13780737) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Letters sent to attorneys: Courtney Hostetler, John Bonifaz, Ben Clements, Ronald Fein, Kelly M. Dermody, Yaman Salahi, Evan Ballan, Avery S. Halfon, and Madeline Gomez regarding admission into the Western District of Texas (bc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott and Ruth Hughs. (bc)
July 16, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Guadalupe Torres. (Lyons, Clarence)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13765852), filed by Guadalupe Torres, Mi Familia Vota, Micaela Rodriguez, Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Clarence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mi Familia Vota et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Clarence V. Lyons
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Michael K. Sheen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Evan J. Ballan
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micaela Rodriguez
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Clarence V. Lyons
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Michael K. Sheen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Evan J. Ballan
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Clarence V. Lyons
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Michael K. Sheen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Evan J. Ballan
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Torres
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Clarence V. Lyons
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Michael K. Sheen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Evan J. Ballan
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Henry J. Bemporad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?