Resendez v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Rudolph Resendez, Jr.
Defendant: Vernet Davis, Lorie Davis, Larissa Wysocki, Greg Abbott and Phonso J. Rayford
Case Number: 5:2020cv00833
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rudolph Resendez, Jr. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rg) (Main Document 6 replaced because some pages were missing on 8/18/2020) (rg).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT - ORDERED that Plaintiff Rudolph Resendez Jr.s Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED and his Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the three-strikes dismissal rule of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - re #1 1983 Complaint filed by Rudolph Resendez, Jr. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED. Resendez is advised that his Complaint may be reinstated only if the full filing fee is paid simultaneously with the filing of a motion to reinstate within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Rudolph Resendez, Jr. (nm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rudolph Resendez, Jr. (nm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Rudolph Resendez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
July 16, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (nm)
July 16, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resendez v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernet Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Wysocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phonso J. Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Resendez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?