Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C. v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.
Defendant: Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00840
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Plts 1st Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. (Attachments: #1 Brief Attachment to Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Anderson, Leanna)
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Proposed Order by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C. re #21 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Loyd, Shannon)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Response to Motion, filed by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C., re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku, Defendant Allstate Insurance Company (bc)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as unopposed #18 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the filing of an amended complaint, entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
September 7, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. (Anderson, Leanna)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. (Attachments: #1 Appendix). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Anderson, Leanna)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The Motion is granted as follows: (1) No Response is due to Defendants, Allstate Insurance Company and Blessing Sefofo Wonyakus, pending Motion to Dismiss; (2) Defendants, Allstate Insurance Company and Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku, shall file an Amended Motion to Dismiss no later than August 24, 2020; (3) Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendants, Allstate Insurance Company and Blessing Sefofo Wonyakus, Amended Motion to Dismiss no later than September 7, 2020; (4) Defendants, Allstate Insurance Company and Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku, may file a Reply no later than September 14, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Response by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C., Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku, and Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon) Modified on 8/10/2020 To edit text (bc).
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dennis J. Windscheffel on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. Attorney Dennis J. Windscheffel added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Dennis J. Windscheffel added to party Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku(pty:dft) (Windscheffel, Dennis)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The Court will consider Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand and attached Appendix in Support filed at Docket No. 9 on July 29, 2020 as if it were timely filed on July 28, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku amending, filed by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Loyd, Shannon)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Response to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Loyd, Shannon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Approval of Late Filing re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Anderson, Leanna)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku, re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Anderson, Leanna) Modified on 7/29/2020 to note that attorney attempted to file on 7/28 but the system was unavailable due to unforeseen outage (kc).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as unopposed #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. It is ORDERED that Leanna M. Anderson of Dentons US LLP is substituted as new counsel for Defendants in place of Michael C. Maus of Susan L. Florence & Associates. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. (Attachments: #1 Appendix). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Anderson, Leanna)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Allstate Insurance Company, Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Anderson, Leanna)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Loyd, Shannon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Supplement State Court Documents)(Maus, Michael)
July 18, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
July 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13774057), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Index, #2 Exhibit Ex. B State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Ex. C State Court Docs, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Notice to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. E Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Ex. F JS44 Suppl, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Consent)(Maus, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C. v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blessing Sefofo Wonyaku
Represented By: Dennis J. Windscheffel
Represented By: Leanna Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Clifton Maus
Represented By: Dennis J. Windscheffel
Represented By: Leanna Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis G. Orsatti, DDS, P.C.
Represented By: Shannon E. Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?