Rosemary Schultz v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Rosemary Schultz
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00853
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Reset Deadlines: The United States of America answer due 9/25/2020. (rg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosemary Schultz. The United States of America served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Peery, Dennis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosemary Schultz. The United States of America served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Peery, Dennis)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney for disposition of all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rg)
July 22, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Rosemary Schultz. (Peery, Dennis)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rosemary Schultz. (Peery, Dennis)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complainant's Original Complaint for Damages under the Federal Tort Claims Act ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13785973), filed by Rosemary Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Peery, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosemary Schultz v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Schultz
Represented By: Dennis Charles Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?