UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Tatum et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Leslie Tatum and Living Health Holistic Healing Center
Case Number: 5:2020cv00907
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT DECREE & FINAL JUDGMENT, #7 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction By Entry of Consent Decree filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The Hearing on the United States motion for Preliminary Injunction currently set for August 26, 2020 is hereby Vacated. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction By Entry of Consent Decree by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van De Walle, Erin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Living Health Holistic Healing Center, Leslie Tatum, re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #3 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lype, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RESETTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION-VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE re #4 Order, Set Motion Hearings, ( VIA VIDEO CONF. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING TRO re #3 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #3 Govt's Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction ( Motion Hearing set Via Video Conference for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,) Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #2 Motion for TRO in light of amended TRO. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
August 5, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
August 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of SA Sirles, #3 Affidavit Declaration of TFO Drake, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of SA Sirles, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of TFO Drake)(Van De Walle, Erin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of SA Sirles, #3 Affidavit Declaration of TFO Drake, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of SA Sirles, #5 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of SA Drake)(Van De Walle, Erin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT United States v. Leslie Tatum and Living Health Holistic Healing Center d/b/a Living Health New Braunfels (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3)(Van De Walle, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Tatum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Tatum
Represented By: Daniel Lype
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Health Holistic Healing Center
Represented By: Daniel Lype
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Erin M. Van De Walle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?