Sanchez-Martinez v. Bandera Family Health Care, P.A
Plaintiff: Rosa Sanchez-Martinez
Defendant: Bandera Family Health Care P.A. doing business as Bandera Family Medical Group
Case Number: 5:2020cv00909
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Bandera Family Health Care P.A.. (Rapp, Robert)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. ADR Report Deadline due by 12/4/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021, Discovery due by 5/31/2021, and Motions due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Scheduling Recommendations Agreed by Bandera Family Health Care P.A. and Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. (Rapp, Robert) Modified on 9/22/2020 To edit text (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Bandera Family Health Care P.A.. (Rapp, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. (Galo, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/28/2020) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Bandera Family Health Care P.A.(pty:dft) by Bandera Family Health Care P.A..(Rapp, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. Bandera Family Health Care P.A. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Galo, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. (Galo, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bandera Family Health Care P.A. (bc)
August 5, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
August 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. (Galo, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13833346), filed by Rosa Sanchez-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Martinez v. Bandera Family Health Care, P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandera Family Health Care P.A. doing business as Bandera Family Medical Group
Represented By: Robert A. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Sanchez-Martinez
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?