Vitus Energy LLC v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Vitus Energy LLC
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 5:2020cv00930
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 11/30/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2021, Discovery due by 6/1/2021, and Motions due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (bc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Scheduling Recommendations by Vitus Energy LLC. and USAA Federal Savings Bank (Ranis, Ethan) Modified on 9/21/2020 To edit text (bc).
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by USAA Federal Savings Bank, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank (Schultz, Theodore)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Vitus Energy LLC, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank (Milvenan, Richard)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties shall submit a proposedscheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (bc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schultz, Theodore)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vitus Energy LLC. USAA Federal Savings Bank served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Milvenan, Richard)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to USAA Federal Savings Bank. (bc)
August 10, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
August 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vitus Energy LLC. (Milvenan, Richard)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Vitus Energy LLC. USAA Federal Savings Bank (Milvenan, Richard)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13846737), filed by Vitus Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milvenan, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitus Energy LLC v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Theodore C. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitus Energy LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Represented By: Andrew M. Edge
Represented By: Ethan Jacob Ranis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?