Raymond v. Ivest Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Raymond
Defendant: Ivest Properties, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00965
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Request and Motion for Clarification or Correction on Cause of Action, Motion for Permanent Restraining Order Against Forcible Detainer Action/Eviction, and Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Default Judgment for 5:19-CV-00596 by Carlos Antonio Raymond (bc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 PRO SE MOTION To Be Excuse From the Court by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (bc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (bc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 PRO SE MOTION for Reconsideration by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(bc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF COUNTER RESPONSE TO IVEST PROPERTIES, LLC MOTION TODISMISS filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3, #2 Envelope)(cd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Certified Mail Receipt- Green Card Return of #8 Report and Recommendations for Carlos Antonio Raymond (bc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ivest Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Substitute Trustee's Deed, #3 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit Final Default Judgment, #5 Exhibit Response-Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #6 Proposed Order)(Valdespino, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Mailing of #8 Report and Recommendations to Carlos Antonio Raymond (bc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond, #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond, #4 Motion to Vacate filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond, GRANTED #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond, DISMISSED AS MOOT #4 MOTION to Vacate filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Notice and Motion to Correct and Replace th JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (bc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons (Not Issued--IFP Pending) (bc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Of Insufficiency of Service by Carlos Antonio Raymond (bc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Of Civil Casuse (Law Suit) and Removal of County Court Action by Carlos Antonio Raymond (bc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate and Motion of Removal of Action by Plaintiff Carlos Antonio Raymond Notice to File Extended Copy of Informa Paupaeris-Financial Affidavit by Carlos Antonio Raymond.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Add Supplemental to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Raymond.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Carlos Antonio Raymond. (dtg)
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
August 17, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtg) Modified TEXT on 8/18/2020 (dtg). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond v. Ivest Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivest Properties, LLC
Represented By: Brenda Rolon
Represented By: Robert D. Valdespino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?