Maria Ochoa v. PSP Franchising LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Maria Ochoa
Defendant: PSP Franchising LLC, SAI 1 Franchising, LLC, SAI 3 Franchising, LLC, SAI 2 Franchising, LLC, SAI 6 Franchising LLC, SAI 5 Franchising LLC, SAI Franchising 4, LLC, SAI 1 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts, SAI 5 Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts, SAI Franchising 4, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts, SAI 3 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts, SAI 2 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts, SAI 6 Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts and PSP Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Case Number: 5:2020cv01064
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 10/4/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/7/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2020, Discovery due by 3/17/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 12/7/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (Setting Status Conference and Hearing on All Pending Motions for 12/10/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Maria Ochoa. (Galo, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Maria Ochoa. (Galo, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by PSP Franchising LLC, SAI 1 Franchising, LLC, SAI 2 Franchising, LLC, SAI 3 Franchising, LLC, SAI 5 Franchising LLC, SAI 6 Franchising LLC, SAI Franchising 4, LLC. (Garcia, R.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Maria Ochoa. (Galo, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AND ADVISORY, (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/6/2020). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party PSP Franchising LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI 1 Franchising, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI 2 Franchising, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI 3 Franchising, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI 5 Franchising LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI 6 Franchising LLC(pty:dft), Attorney R. Carlo Garcia added to party SAI Franchising 4, LLC(pty:dft) by PSP Franchising LLC, SAI 1 Franchising, LLC, SAI 2 Franchising, LLC, SAI 3 Franchising, LLC, SAI 5 Franchising LLC, SAI 6 Franchising LLC, SAI Franchising 4, LLC.(Garcia, R.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI 6 Franchising LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI 5 Franchising LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI Franchising 4, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI 3 Franchising, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI 2 Franchising, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. SAI 1 Franchising, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ochoa. PSP Franchising LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Galo, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to SAI 6 Franchising LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SAI 5 Franchising LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SAI Franchising 4, LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SAI 3 Franchising, LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SAI 2 Franchising, LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SAI 1 Franchising, LLC. (rg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PSP Franchising LLC. (rg)
September 8, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
September 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria Ochoa. (Galo, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13943263), filed by Maria Ochoa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Ochoa v. PSP Franchising LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ochoa
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSP Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 1 Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 3 Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 2 Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 6 Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 5 Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI Franchising 4, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 1 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 5 Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI Franchising 4, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 3 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 2 Franchising, LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAI 6 Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSP Franchising LLC d/b/a Dunkin Donuts
Represented By: R. Carlo Garcia
Represented By: Scott E. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?