Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Doerr et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Bobby R. Clements d/b/a Beer Lease, Kenneth A. Doerr d/b/a Beer Lease, Kenneth A. Doerr doing business as Beer Lease and Bobby R. Clements doing business as Beer Lease
Case Number: 5:2020cv01111
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Substitute. Plaintiff may serve DefendantDoerr by leaving a true copy of the Summons, with a copy of the Complaint attached, with anyone over sixteen years of age at the property located at 421 Ferryboat Lane, New Braunfels, Texas 78130, with additional service by first class regular mail. Plaintiff shall promptly file a proof of service upon completion. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Service of Process on Defendant, Kenneth A. Doerr, d/b/a Beer Lease by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Bobby R. Clements served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (King, Jamie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth A. Doerr and Bobby R. Clements. (cd)
September 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd)
September 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13980234), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Doerr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby R. Clements d/b/a Beer Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A. Doerr d/b/a Beer Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A. Doerr doing business as Beer Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby R. Clements doing business as Beer Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?