Binhozaim v. Huron et al
Petitioner: Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Andrew Huron, Matthew T. Albence, Daniel Bible and Ray Castro
Case Number: 5:2020cv01137
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Respondents Response and Motion for Summary Judgment by Matthew T. Albence, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro, Andrew Huron, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloodworth, Kristin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of Petitioner's Section 2241 complaint as to Ray Castro. (wg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt returned as delivered of #7 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, (wg)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SERVICE ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim, Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall forward a Copy of Petition of Writ of Habeas Corpus, and this Order via Certified Mail Return receipt Requested. This would constitute service on the respondents as set out in the Order. The Clerk of Court shall serve Respondent Ray Castro, Warden, South Texas Ice Processing Center, with copies of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order, and such delivery by certified mail return receipt requested will constitute sufficient service of process. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500055767 (wg)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order,Binhozaim must either remit the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court or file with this Court a current institutional trust fund account statement showing deposits and balances to his institutional account for the previous six months.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim. (nm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim. (nm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
September 22, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (nm)
September 22, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binhozaim v. Huron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas S. Wimkowski
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Huron
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Castro
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdulrahman Abdulaziz Binhozaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?