Quintana Perez v. Barr, et al
Petitioner: Enrique Quintana Perez
Respondent: Attorney General, Warden, ICE Field Office Director, Secretary of DHS, William Barr, Ray Castro, Daniel Bible and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv01190
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by William Barr, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McAndrew, Lacy)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION against William Barr, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro, and Chad Wolf amending #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Enrique Quintana Perez. **Petitioner's signature was added to the petition**(bc)
October 29, 2020 Mailed out Petition #1 for signature and Order #7 to the Plaintiff at the South Texas Detention Complex address (bc)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER --Upon review, the Court finds Perez failed to sign the Petition. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall return the Petition to Perez. Perez shall sign the Petition and return it to the Clerk of Court immediately. Failure to comply with the Courts order may result in the dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt-Green Card return for Ray Castro, Warden of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Order (bc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt-Green Card Return for U.S. Attorney's Office of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Order (bc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order (mgr)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Respondents shall file an answer or response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within thirty (30) days from the date of service. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Enrique Quintana Perez. (nm)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 500055700), filed by Enrique Quintana Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt, #3 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
October 5, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (nm)
October 5, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO GARCIA. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintana Perez v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Castro
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enrique Quintana Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?