Lopez v. Wolf, et al
Plaintiff: Heriberto Ruiz Lopez
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Daniel Bible, Tony H. Pham, Homeland Security, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf and Ray Castro
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 5:2020cv01195
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by William P. Barr, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro, Tony H. Pham, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (McAndrew, Lacy)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt- Green Card Return for Raymundo Castro, Warden of #5 Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (bc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt- Green Card Return for U.S. Attorney's Office of #5 Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (bc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mailing to Raymundo Castro, Warden of #5 Order Directing Service and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mailing to United States Attorney's Office of #5 Order Directing Service and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bc)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE--The Court hereby ORDERS Respondents to file a response to the Petition within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of service. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT--THE SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED AT THIS TIME. THE COURT WILL ISSUE A SERVICE ORDER IF NECESSARY. re #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, (bc)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-THE SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED AT THIS TIME. THE COURT WILL ENTER A SERVICE ORDER IF NECESSARY*** REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Heriberto Ruiz Lopez. (Garza Izaguirre, Patricio) Modified on 10/16/2020 To edit text (bc).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 500055761), filed by Heriberto Ruiz Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(bc)
October 8, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
October 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Ruiz Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?