Emuch v. Huron et al
Petitioner: PM Emuch
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Andrew Huron and Daniel Bible
Case Number: 5:2020cv01357
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT, Pursuant to this Courts Order, the 28 U.S.C. 2241 Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Petitioner PM Emuch is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Petitioner sought solely his release from ICE custody. As a result, his release renders his Section 2241 petition moot. (challenge to ICE detention pending removal was moot where petitioner was no longer detained). Accordingly, Petitioners 28 U.S.C. 2241 Habeas Corpus Petition (ECF No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Matthew T. Albence, Daniel Bible, Andrew Huron, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Chad Wolf . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McAndrew, Lacy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of Petitioner's Section 2241 Habeas Corpus as to Matthew T. Albence, Daniel Bible, Andrew Huron, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Chad Wolf. (wg)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt of #10 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #12 Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, (wg)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER re #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioners Motion to Proceed IFP isDISMISSED AS MOOT. (ECF No. 9). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. District Clerk: (1) furnish the Office of the U.S. Attorney in San Antonio, Texas, with copies of the Amended Petition (ECF No. 10) and this Order, and that such delivery by certified mail return receipt requested will constitute sufficientservice of process on Respondent Wolf; and (2) serve Respondents Andrew Huron and Daniel Bible by certified mail return receipt requested. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents must file an answer or otherwise respond to the Petition within thirty (30) days from the date of service. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner submit the filing fee of $5.00 on or beforeJanuary 20, 2021. Failure to comply with the Courts order may result in the dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 3rd (Duplicate) Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed & filed by PM Emuch.(wg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 PRO-SE MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by PM Emuch. (wg)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by PM Emuch.(wg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed & signed by PM Emuch.(wg)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order,Emuch must submit to this Court a signed and dated Section 2241 Petition. re #3 Order, Failure to do so may be interpreted as failure to prosecute and result in involuntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500056136 (wg)
November 30, 2020 Remark: Copy of Order, IFP Application & Petition 2241 for Signature was sent to the petitioner at STDC, Pearsall, Texas. (wg)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Inmate Trust Account Statement filed by PM Emuch. (wg)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, that the Petitioner is Ordered to file within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Emuch must submit to this Court a signed and dated Section 2241 Petition, along with either the required filing fee of $5.00 or a completed application to proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court isdirected to forward to Emuch a 2241 Petition along with this Court's standard IFP application. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to PM Emuch. (nm)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by PM Emuch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
November 19, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (nm)
November 19, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K PULLIAM. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emuch v. Huron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas S. Wimkowski
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Huron
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PM Emuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?