ETG Aviation, LLC et al v. Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TP Host, LLC and ETG Aviation, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-20, Textron Aviation Inc., Castine Airways, LLC and Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01418
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 4/16/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2021, Discovery due by 10/1/2021,, Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2021,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Textron Aviation Inc., Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(David, Bryan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Denny, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Scheduling Recommendations by Textron Aviation Inc.. (Denny, David) & (Louis Franecke) Modified on 1/15/2021 (wg).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Kucera ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14362667) by on behalf of ETG Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, Megan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received in the amount of $100, receipt number 0542-14362655. (Kucera, Megan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ETG Aviation, LLC. (Kucera, Megan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Castine Airways, LLC, Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC. (Anderson, Geffrey)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC and Castine Airways, LLC ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Geffrey W. Anderson added to party Castine Airways, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Geffrey W. Anderson added to party Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC(pty:dft) by Castine Airways, LLC, Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC.(Anderson, Geffrey)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposedscheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order.Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cd)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Textron Aviation Inc..(David, Bryan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Textron Aviation Inc.. (David, Bryan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Textron Aviation Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14277884), filed by Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(David, Bryan)
December 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 11, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETG Aviation, LLC et al v. Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation Inc.
Represented By: David Denny
Represented By: Bryan Scott David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castine Airways, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Dugan
Represented By: Geffrey W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Point Consultancy, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Dugan
Represented By: Geffrey W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TP Host, LLC
Represented By: Megan Kucera
Represented By: Keith P. Miller
Represented By: Louis S. Franecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETG Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Megan Kucera
Represented By: Keith P. Miller
Represented By: Louis S. Franecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?