Z.M.G.L. et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Defendant: Daniel Bible, Chad Wolf, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tony H. Pham and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Z.M.G.L. and A.S.C.G.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01436
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Status Conference held on 12/22/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(mgr)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.S.C.G., Z.M.G.L. (McGraw, Peter)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Daniel Bible, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bc)
December 18, 2020 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO EDIT THE TITLE OF THE ORDER AND TO ADD THE HEARING DATE/TIME INFORMATION*** re #5 Order on Motion for TRO. (bc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Letter sent to attorneys: Shalyn Fluharty and Brianna Rennix regarding admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by A.S.C.G., Z.M.G.L.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement)(McGraw, Peter)
December 17, 2020 Set Hearings: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 12/22/2020 10:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, (bc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #4 AND SETTING IN-PERSON HEARING-- This Order expires exactly 14 days after entry unless further ordered by this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case is set for an in person HEARING before U.S. District Judge David A. Ezra in Courtroom 5, on the Third Floor of the John H. Wood, Jr. United States Courthouse, 655 East Cesar E. Chavez Boulevard, San Antonio, TX, on Tuesday, December 22, 2020 at 10:30 AM. (mo) Modified on 12/18/2020 To edit text (bc).
December 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge farrer (wg)
December 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 CORRECTED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by A.S.C.G., Z.M.G.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by A.S.C.G., Z.M.G.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File using Pseudonym by A.S.C.G., Z.M.G.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14298385). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Z.M.G.L., A.S.C.G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGraw, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z.M.G.L. et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Z.M.G.L.
Represented By: Peter Eammon McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.S.C.G.
Represented By: Peter Eammon McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?