St. Pierre et al v. Ward, et al
Plaintiff: Charles McCain and John St. Pierre
Defendant: Molly Creswell, Hanna McRee, Roger Ward-San Antonio, Inc. d/b/a Ward North American and Roger Ward San Antonio, Inc doing business as Ward North American
Case Number: 5:2020cv01481
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by John St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loree, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Charles McCain, re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff John St. Pierre, Plaintiff Charles McCain (Loree, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Molly Creswell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
February 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Roger Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Molly Creswell, Roger Ward, re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff John St. Pierre, Plaintiff Charles McCain (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 4/5/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021, Discovery due by 10/1/2021, Motions due by 11/1/2021,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendants deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is extended from February 8, 2021 to February16, 2021. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Molly Creswell, Hanna McRee, Roger Ward. (Henry, Vic)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Molly Creswell, Hanna McRee, Roger Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Dismiss & DENYING #5 Motion to Dismiss . If Defendants seek to refile their motions in light of the amended complaint, they shall do so no later than February 16, 2021. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from the date that Defendants file their new motions to file new responses to the motions. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) Modified on 2/9/2021, to edit text (mgr).
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Charles McCain, John St. Pierre, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Defendant Roger Ward (Loree, Robert)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Charles McCain, John St. Pierre, re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Defendant Hanna McRee, Defendant Molly Creswell (Loree, Robert)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles McCain, John St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Loree, Robert)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by John St. Pierre, Charles McCain.(Loree, Robert) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/3/2021) (wg).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall file their responses to the two pending motions to dismiss (Dkts. # 4, 5) no later than February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Charles McCain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Loree, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Charles McCain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Loree, Robert)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Molly Creswell, Hanna McRee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic) .
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Roger Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Letter sent to attorney Christopher Below regarding admission into the Western District of Texas.(cd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/4/2021) (cd).
December 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
December 31, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (cd)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Molly Creswell, Hanna McRee, Roger Ward-San Antonio, Inc. d/b/a Ward North American. (Henry, Vic)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Molly Creswell, Roger Ward-San Antonio, Inc. d/b/a Ward North American, Hanna McRee (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14331654), filed by Molly Creswell, Roger Ward-San Antonio, Inc. d/b/a Ward North American, Hanna McRee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Documents Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Petition and Requests for Disclosure, #3 Exhibit C-Citation to Rober Ward-San Antonio, Inc d/b/a Ward North American, #4 Exhibit D-Citation to Molly Creswell, #5 Exhibit E-Citation to Hanna McRee, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Pierre et al v. Ward, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McCain
Represented By: Robert W. Loree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John St. Pierre
Represented By: Robert W. Loree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Creswell
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna McRee
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ward-San Antonio, Inc. d/b/a Ward North American
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ward San Antonio, Inc doing business as Ward North American
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?