Moya v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maria D. Moya
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #8 MOTION for Protective Order Against and Dissolution of State Court Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of the Deposition of Allstate's Corprate Representative filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Novak, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENC ( Scheduling Recommendations due by 4/2/2021 and Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Maria D. Moya, re #8 MOTION for Protective Order Against and Dissolution of State Court Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of the Deposition of Allstate's Corprate Representative filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Thompson, Jason)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Novak, Michael)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Facts by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order Against and Dissolution of State Court Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of the Deposition of Allstate's Corprate Representative by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valdez, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Maria D. Moya (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Novak, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Maria D. Moya, re #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Thompson, Jason)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Maria D. Moya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Jason)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Novak, Michael)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after any defendant has appeared. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Petition by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Valdez, Robert)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14349832), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Valdez, Robert)
January 7, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moya v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Moya
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Represented By: Michael Maurice Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?