V. et al v. Rosen et al
Plaintiff: S. B. P., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, S. L. V., N. C. L., Minor, A. O. V., J. S. O., Minor, S. L. R., D. P. R., R. L. A. and M. F. L., Minor
Defendant: Acting Atty Gen Jeffrey A. Rosen, Dir EOIR James E. McHenry and Peter Gaynor
Case Number: 5:2021cv00017
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINAL JUDGMENT, The Court has considered the issues presented in this action and rendered its decision. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order issued contemporaneously with this Final Judgment, the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, the Court finds that it lacks jurisdiction over this case, and it DENIES Plaintiffs Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 2), which the Court has considered as a motion for preliminary injunction in accordance with its Administrative Order to Stay Removal (ECF No. 4). Because the Court has now determined that it lacksjurisdiction over this matter, it LIFTS the administrative stay previously entered in this case. the Court DISMISSES this action for lack of jurisdiction. It will enter final judgment by separate document. In addition, the Court FINDS that justice does not require any reconsideration of the Courts issuance of the administrative stay of removal and thus DENIES Defendants Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 22, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE Reply to #19 MOTION to supplement re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) and in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Reconsider by James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen. (McAndrew, Lacy)
January 22, 2021 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE ENTRY WAS EDITED TO REMOVE THE MOTION STATUS AND EDIT TITLE*** re #19 MOTION to supplement re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) and in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Reconsider. (mgr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 Supplemental Briefing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) and in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Reconsider by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. (Stratton, C.) Modified on 1/22/2021, to edit text (mgr).
January 21, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jason K. Pulliam: Taken under Advisement, Written Order Forthcoming.Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2021 re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Jeffrey A. Rosen, James E. McHenry, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) filed by D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, R. L. A., A. O. V., S. L. R., S. L. V., J. S. O., Minor (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Tish Moncivias.)(wg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V., re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Jeffrey A. Rosen, Defendant James E. McHenry (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brianna Rennix, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brianna Rennix, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Brianna Rennix, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Brianna Rennix, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Brianna Rennix, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Brianna Rennix, #7 Proposed Order)(Heller, Caroline)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intent to Rely on Arguments Raised in Defendant's by James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration (McAndrew, Lacy) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rg).
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General. (wg)
January 19, 2021 Notice of Correction: Summons for McHenry were Duplicates, Plaintiff's need to Submit missing summons Jeffrey Rosen. re #13 Summons Issued as to USA. (wg)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING AND SETTING HEARING re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) filed by D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, R. L. A., A. O. V., S. L. R., S. L. V., J. S. O., Minor, #12 MOTION for Reconsideration ( Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Jason K. Pulliam,) It is further ORDERED that any Response to the motion to reconsider is also due on or before January 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Peter Gaynor, James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wg)
January 15, 2021 Notice of Correction: Certificate of Service, Copies must be sent Via E-mail or US Mail to Counsel, case does not allow CM/ECF Elec. Notification: re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration , #11 Status Report. (wg)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration by James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(McAndrew, Lacy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen. (McAndrew, Lacy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. of Defendant Peter Gaynor (Stratton, C.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. of Defendant James E. McHenry (Stratton, C.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. of Defendant Jeffrey A. Rosen (Stratton, C.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 1st AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter Gaynor, James E. McHenry, Jeffrey A. Rosen amending #1 Complaint,., filed by J. S. O., Minor, R. L. A., S. L. R., D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, S. L. V., S. B. P., Minor, A. O. V..(wg)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER, The Court hereby ORDERS Defendants to file an Advisory and status for each Plaintiff on or before January 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jason K. Pulliam: Motion taken under advisement, Written Order Forthcoming.Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2021 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) filed by D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, R. L. A., A. O. V., S. L. R., S. L. V., J. S. O., Minor (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Tish Moncivias.)(wg)
January 11, 2021 Motion Hearing: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application). Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Jason K. Pulliam via video conference. (mam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO STAY REMOVAL and Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) filed by D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, R. L. A., A. O. V., S. L. R., S. L. V., J. S. O., Minor. The Court, furthermore, sets this matter for hearing on Monday, January 25, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. before U.S. District Judge Jason Pulliam via video conference. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jf)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C. Mark Stratton for Caroline Jean Heller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14360863) by on behalf of R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. (Attachments: #1 Additional Bar Information, #2 Proposed Order)(Stratton, C.)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Application) by R. L. A., A. V. L., Minor, M. F. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, J. S. O., Minor, S. B. P., Minor, D. P. R., S. L. R., A. O. V., S. L. V.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shalyn Fluharty, #2 Proposed Order)(Stratton, C.)
January 11, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
January 11, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14359729), filed by J. S. O., Minor, R. L. A., S. L. R., D. P. R., M. F. L., Minor, A. V. L., Minor, N. C. L., Minor, S. L. V., S. B. P., Minor, A. O. V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stratton, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V. et al v. Rosen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B. P., Minor
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. V. L., Minor
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L. V.
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. C. L., Minor
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O. V.
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S. O., Minor
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L. R.
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. P. R.
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. L. A.
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F. L., Minor
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Represented By: Caroline Jean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Atty Gen Jeffrey A. Rosen
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir EOIR James E. McHenry
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?