Cardora Roberson v. Rayford et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cardora Roberson
Defendant: Larissa S. Wysocki, Phonso J. Rayford, Nurudeen O. Ogunrinola, Ruth E. Trice, Christy K. Solis, Jesus A. Avalos, Rolando Cerda, Jr, Anita S. Fullwood, Ryan F. King, Jordan J. Portillo, Michael R. Melton and Vernet A. Davis, Jr
Case Number: 5:2021cv00051
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Cardora Roberson. (mgr)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal by Michael Cardora Roberson. (mgr)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion for Memorandum of Law Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction & a Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Cardora Roberson (mgr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration of Michael C. Roberson by Michael Cardora Roberson. (mgr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION for Memorandum of Law by Michael Cardora Roberson. (mgr)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Cardora Roberson. (rg)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Michael Cardora Roberson. (nm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Michael Cardora Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
January 15, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (nm)
January 15, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K. PULLIAM. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardora Roberson v. Rayford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa S. Wysocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phonso J. Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurudeen O. Ogunrinola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth E. Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy K. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus A. Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando Cerda, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita S. Fullwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan F. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan J. Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernet A. Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cardora Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?