Arnold et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Arnold and Michael Arnold
Defendant: Sirva Relocation, LLC, Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Allied Van Lines, Inc. and John Does 1 and 2
Case Number: 5:2021cv00438
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Van Lines, Inc. amending, filed by Michael Arnold.(Bressi, Nicholas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of the Parties by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Henry, Vic)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 31, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3)
May 10, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Allied Van Lines, Inc. answer due 5/31/2021; Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. answer due 5/31/2021; Sirva Relocation, LLC answer due 5/31/2021. (bc)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC . (Henry, Vic)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Henry, Vic)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sirva Relocation, LLC, Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14761753), filed by Sirva Relocation, LLC, Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index for Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1A - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 1B - Affidavit for Service on Allied, #4 Exhibit 1C - Affidavit for Service on Sirva, #5 Exhibit 1D - Affidavit for Service on Coleman, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Henry, Vic)
May 3, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
May 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirva Relocation, LLC
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 and 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?