United States of America v. Nakissa, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa, M.D., Don N. Otchere, SOCA Funding, L.L.C., Bexar County, Texas, George Ramonas, MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C., Emily Bernadette Nakissa, Adrienne Darice Nakissa, Aria Daniel Nakissa and Maxine Elizabeth Schur Korus
Claimant: Bexar County Road and Flood, Alamo Community College, University Health System, San Antonio River Authority, Southside Independent School District and Bexar County Emergency Services District No. 6
Case Number: 5:2021cv00495
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa, M.D. served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Notinger, Ramona)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C... Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Giese, Erica)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Benites Giese on behalf of MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C.. Attorney Erica Benites Giese added to party MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Giese, Erica)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The deadline for Defendant MaraGas Texas Utilities, LLC, to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to August 31, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
June 24, 2021 Reset Deadlines: MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C. answer due 8/31/2021. (bc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Verified Claim of Bexar County, Texas, et al. by Alamo Community College, Bexar County Emergency Services District No. 6, Bexar County Road and Flood, Bexar County, Texas, San Antonio River Authority, Southside Independent School District, University Health System (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gruver, Lori)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bexar County, Texas, et al.. Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Bexar County, Texas(pty:dft) by Alamo Community College, Bexar County Emergency Services District No. 6, Bexar County Road and Flood, Bexar County, Texas, San Antonio River Authority, Southside Independent School District, University Health System.(Gruver, Lori)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bexar County Road and Flood, Alamo Community College, University Health System, San Antonio River Authority, Southside Independent School District, Bexar County Emergency Services District No. 6. (Gruver, Lori)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by George Ramonas.(bc)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Walter W. Church added to party Maxine Elizabeth Schur Korus(pty:dft) by Maxine Elizabeth Schur Korus.(Church, Walter)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa, M.D. (bc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/25/2021) (bc).
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa M.D. (Notinger, Ramona)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bexar County, Texas, Maxine Elizabeth Schur Korus, MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C., Adrienne Darice Nakissa, Aria Daniel Nakissa, Emily Bernadette Nakissa, Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa, M.D., Don N. Otchere, George Ramonas, and SOCA Funding, L.L.C.. (bc)
May 24, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
May 24, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. Summonses to All Defendants (Notinger, Ramona)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT United States' Original Complaint (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Notinger, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nakissa, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nasser Nicholai Nakissa, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don N. Otchere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCA Funding, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County, Texas
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ramonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaraGas Texas Utilities, L.L.C.
Represented By: Erica Benites Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Bernadette Nakissa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Darice Nakissa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Daniel Nakissa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Elizabeth Schur Korus
Represented By: Walter W. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona Stephens Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Road and Flood
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alamo Community College
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: University Health System
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: San Antonio River Authority
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Southside Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Emergency Services District No. 6
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?