CircuitLife, LLC v. Percussionaire Corp. et al
Plaintiff: CircuitLife, LLC
Defendant: Mark Baillie and Percussionaire Corp.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00549
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff has up to and including August 18, 2021 to file their responsive pleading to Defendant Percussionaires Plea to the Jurisdiction, and Motion to Dismiss entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Answer to Complaint, #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Plea to Jurisdiction and Motions to Dismiss by CircuitLife, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harkins, Jack)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order for Scheduling Recommendations-- The parties are to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Mark Baillie's Plea to the Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss, and Original Answer Subject Thereto. Attorney Philip Robert Brinson added to party Mark Baillie(pty:dft) by Mark Baillie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Appendix Technical Appendix "1")(Brinson, Philip)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to Complaint and Plea to Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss by Percussionaire Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Errata Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Appendix Technical Appendix)(Deegear, James) Modified edited text on 7/27/2021 (wg).
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties by Mark Baillie, Percussionaire Corp.. (Kain, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Mark Baillie answer due 7/21/2021; Percussionaire Corp. answer due 7/21/2021. (bc)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants have up to and including July 21, 2021 to file their responsive pleading to the Complaint entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint By Circuitlife, LLC by Percussionaire Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Badders, Matthew)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert C Kain, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Darren Spielman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Justin Badders for Darren Spielman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14978743) by on behalf of Percussionaire Corp.. (Badders, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Justin Badders for Robert C Kain, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14978642) by on behalf of Percussionaire Corp.. (Badders, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 Report on Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bc)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Floyd A. Mandell. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia L. Mazur. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carolyn M. Passen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Daniel Harkins for Julia L. Mazur ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14894033) by on behalf of CircuitLife, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Julia L. Mazur Pro Hac Vice)(Harkins, Jack)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Daniel Harkins for Carolyn M. Passen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14894018) by on behalf of CircuitLife, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Carolyn M. Passen Pro Hac Vice)(Harkins, Jack)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Daniel Harkins for Floyd A. Mandell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14893951) by on behalf of CircuitLife, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Floyd A. Mandell Pro Hac Vice)(Harkins, Jack)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark Baillie and Percussionaire Corp. (bc)
June 8, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
June 8, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CircuitLife, LLC. Percussionaire and Mark Baillie (Harkins, Jack)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14887718), filed by CircuitLife, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet Form)(Harkins, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CircuitLife, LLC v. Percussionaire Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Baillie
Represented By: James O. Deegear, III
Represented By: Matthew Justin Badders
Represented By: Philip Robert Brinson
Represented By: Robert C. Kain, Jr.
Represented By: Darren Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percussionaire Corp.
Represented By: Darren Spielman
Represented By: James O. Deegear, III
Represented By: Matthew Justin Badders
Represented By: Robert C. Kain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CircuitLife, LLC
Represented By: Jack Daniel Harkins
Represented By: Carolyn M. Passen
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Ryan D. Borelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?