Christine v. Republic Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christine Zapata and Ramiro Jordan Zapata
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc., Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc., Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP, Robert Youngblood, Hartford Life Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Valarie Zapata and Jose Zapata
Case Number: 5:2021cv00800
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 Remand Letter returned from the Bexar County District Clerk's Office (bc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 Remand Letter Mailed out with certified copies of Order #14 and Docket Sheet to the Bexar County District Clerk (bc)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Remand to State Court; DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE #8 Motion to Quash; and #10 Motion to Compel; DENIED #13 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defs' Sur-Reply on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP, Republic Services, Inc., Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc., Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, Robert Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Warren, Larry)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jose Zapata, Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Valarie Zapata, Christine Zapata, re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for Abatement or Dismissal filed by Defendant Robert Youngblood, Defendant Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, Defendant Republic Services, Inc., Defendant Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc., Defendant BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jose Zapata, Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Valarie Zapata, Christine Zapata, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Valarie Zapata, Plaintiff Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Plaintiff Christine Zapata, Plaintiff Jose Zapata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for Abatement or Dismissal by BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP, Republic Services, Inc., Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc., Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, Robert Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Warren, Larry)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP, Republic Services, Inc., Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc., Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, Robert Youngblood, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Valarie Zapata, Plaintiff Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Plaintiff Christine Zapata, Plaintiff Jose Zapata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Warren, Larry)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Quash by BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP, Republic Services, Inc., Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD, Robert Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Warren, Larry)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jose Zapata, Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Valarie Zapata, Christine Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal of the Declaratory Judgment Action involving Hartford Insurance Defendants by Jose Zapata, Ramiro Jordan Zapata, Valarie Zapata, Christine Zapata (Wilson, Robert)
September 5, 2021 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hartford Life Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. . (Baker, Joshua)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter-William B. Wahlheim Jr. (bc)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Court ORDERS that Hartford Defendants file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than September 30, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021. (bc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Life Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Joshua)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 26, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
August 26, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Life Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15159715), filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B Report of Employee Benefit Plan, #3 Exhibit C Report of Employee Benefit Plan, #4 Exhibit D Policy, #5 Exhibit E Republic's Consent to Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement To Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine v. Republic Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Zapata
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Jordan Zapata
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Waste Services Group of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Waste Services of Texas, LTD
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFI Waste Services of Texas, LP
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Youngblood
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie Zapata
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Zapata
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?