Cherniss et al v. State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Donald Kevin Cherniss and Suzan Cherniss
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company and State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00812
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE-SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS ( Status Conference set for 11/23/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/25/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Mediation Completed by 4/26/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2021, Discovery due by 3/29/2022, Motions due by 4/26/2022,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, ( Status Conference set for 11/16/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order CONDITIONALLY GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Because movant has been admitted pro hac vice several times before, the Court will permit movant to appear pro hac vic in this case pending application to the Western District. Accordingly, movant is ordered to apply for admission to practice before this Court within 60 days, diligently pursue the application until the time of admission, and advise the Court once admitted. Further, if not already done, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dean William Greer on behalf of Patrick Ellis Hundley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15285756) by on behalf of Donald Kevin Cherniss, Suzan Cherniss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greer, Dean)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company. (Stephens, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Scheduling Recommendations by State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company. (Stephens, David)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company . (Stephens, David)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Amended NOTICE of Removal by State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C)(Stephens, David)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company . (Stephens, David)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations due by 9/30/2021. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Patrick Ellis Hundley regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Lloyds (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15165300), filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Index of Matters Being Filing, #2 Exhibit Exh A, #3 Exhibit Exh B, #4 Exhibit Exh C, #5 Exhibit Exh D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 JS Supp Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, David)
August 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 27, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherniss et al v. State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kevin Cherniss
Represented By: Patrick Ellis Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzan Cherniss
Represented By: Patrick Ellis Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: David R. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: David R. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?