Houston Justice, et al v. Gregory Wayne Abbott, et al
Plaintiff: Houston Justice, Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.
Defendant: Gregory Wayne Abbott, Jose Esparza, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr., Jacque Callanen and Isabel Longoria
Case Number: 5:2021cv00848
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE, On this date, the Court considered the status of this case. Concurrently herewith, the Court issues an order consolidating this case under La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.). That order instructs the parties to file all future filings in La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.). Given these circumstances, the Court concludes that this case is appropriate for administrative closure re #20 Consolidation Order,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION, The Court hereby ORDERS that OCA-GreaterHouston v. Esparza, No. 1:21-cv-780 (W.D. Tex.); Houston Justice v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-848 (W.D. Tex.); LULAC Texas v. Esparza, No. 1:21-cv-786 (W.D. Tex.) and Mi Familia Vota v. Abbott, No. 5: 21-cv-920 be consolidated into La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.). It is ORDERED that all future filings be filed ONLY in La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.) Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE Regarding Pending Motion to Consolidate by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Jose Esparza, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr (White, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. Jose Esparza served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. Jacque Callanen served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. Isabel Longoria served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. Gregory Wayne Abbott served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Jose Esparza, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Partially-Opposed Motion to Consolidate in Case No. 5:21-cv-844 by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Jose Esparza, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sweeten, Patrick)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)(Broughton, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jose Esparza, In his Official Capacity as Texas Deputy Secretary of State of Texas. (wg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gregory Wayne Abbott, Jacque Callanen, Isabel Longoria, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr. (wg)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr Kathryn Sadasivan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15193959) by on behalf of Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr Georgina Yeomans ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15193924) by on behalf of Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr J. Keely Dulaney ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15193896) by on behalf of Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr Jennifer A. Holmes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15193222) by on behalf of The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr Shira Wakschlag ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15193168) by on behalf of Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey, The Arc of Texas. (Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15192627), filed by The Arc of Texas, Houston Justice, Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc., Lamar Clemmons Jeffrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Broughton, Kenneth)
September 7, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Justice, et al v. Gregory Wayne Abbott, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Justice
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Represented By: Georgina Yeomans
Represented By: J. Keely Dulaney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Holmes
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Shira Wakschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Sigm Theta Sorority Inc.
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Area Urban League
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Represented By: Georgina Yeomans
Represented By: J. Keely Dulaney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Holmes
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Shira Wakschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Arc of Texas
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Represented By: Georgina Yeomans
Represented By: J. Keely Dulaney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Holmes
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Shira Wakschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Represented By: Georgina Yeomans
Represented By: J. Keely Dulaney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Holmes
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Shira Wakschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.
Represented By: Georgina Yeomans
Represented By: J. Keely Dulaney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Holmes
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Represented By: Sarah M. Cummings
Represented By: Shira Wakschlag
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Wayne Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Esparza
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacque Callanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?