Obaya v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Amali Obaya
Defendant: Allstate Texas Lloyds and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00935
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 21 Clerk's Copy of #20 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court (mgr)
October 27, 2021 Mailed Out Remand Letter along with certified copies of #20 Order and Docket Sheet to the Bexar County District Clerk (bc)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the 288th Judicial District Court of Bexar County, Texas and to close this case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Valdez, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Valdez, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO EDIT THE TEXT TO AMENDED NON-CONSENT*** re #17 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge. (bc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 Defendant's Amended Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Valdez, Robert) Modified on 10/22/2021 To edit text (bc).
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carole Stewart Anhalt on behalf of Amali Obaya (Anhalt, Carole)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Texas Lloyds amending, filed by Amali Obaya.(Hodge, Shaun)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to October 27, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldox)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Amali Obaya. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anhalt, Carole)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amali Obaya, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Amali Obaya w/EX A-H (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hodge, Shaun)
October 11, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Amali Obaya (Valdez, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Allstate Texas Lloyds . (Valdez, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended Notice of Removal, by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valdez, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Allstate Texas Lloyds re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Valdez, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Valdez, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations due by 11/5/2021. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amali Obaya. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodge, Shaun)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter- Jahan Guram. (bc)
October 1, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 1, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant Allstate Texas Lloyds ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Original Petition by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valdez, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Valdez, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Texas Lloyds (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15286770), filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obaya v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amali Obaya
Represented By: Carole Stewart Anhalt
Represented By: Katherine Cora Hairfield
Represented By: Shaun W. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Texas Lloyds
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda L. Stephens
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?