Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Wind Energy Transport, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Wind Energy Transport, LLC, XS Heavy Haul, Inc., Jesse Miller, John Malenky and Patricia Twa
Case Number: 5:2021cv00943
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Wind Energy Transport, LLC answer due 12/8/2021. (rg)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as UNOPPOSED #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Wind Energy Transport, LLC to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to December 8, 2021. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wind Energy Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Brown, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Wind Energy Transport, LLC served on 10/25/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Alkas, Peri)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. XS Heavy Haul, Inc. served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Alkas, Peri)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Jesse Miller served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (Alkas, Peri)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Patricia Twa. (rg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Patricia Twa. (rg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to John Malenky. (rg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jesse Miller. (rg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to XS Heavy Haul, Inc. (rg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wind Energy Transport, LLC. (rg)
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Alkas, Peri)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer for dispositionof all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15294589). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Alkas, Peri)
October 4, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
October 4, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Wind Energy Transport, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Peri H. Alkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wind Energy Transport, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XS Heavy Haul, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Malenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Twa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?