Champion v. Phaselink Utility Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Champion
Defendant: PHASELINK UTILITY SOLUTIONS, LLC, Yanping Wolfe and Daryl Bennett
Case Number: 5:2022cv00145
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment is extended to June 21, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (LR)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Entry of Final Default Judgment by Jennifer Champion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Alexander, William)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Phaselink Utility Solutions, LLC (nm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against PhaseLink Utility Solutions, LLC and Daryl Bennett by Jennifer Champion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Affidavit in Support). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Alexander, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT within 21 days from the date of this Order, the Plaintiff shall move for entry of default and default judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55. Failure to timely do so will subject Plaintiffs claims to dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (nm)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jennifer Champion. (Alexander, William)
April 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Yanping Wolfe answer due 5/11/2022. (nm)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as UNOPPOSED #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. Defendant Yanping Wolfe's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended until May 11, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (LR)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yanping Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Temple, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Temple on behalf of Yanping Wolfe. Attorney Mark D. Temple added to party Yanping Wolfe(pty:dft) (Temple, Mark)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Champion. Daryl Bennett served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022; Phaselink Utility Solutions, LLC served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022; Yanping Wolfe served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. (Alexander, William)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (nm)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
February 17, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
February 17, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jennifer Champion. (Alexander, William)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15726185), filed by Jennifer Champion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Employment Contract)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Phaselink Utility Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Champion
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHASELINK UTILITY SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanping Wolfe
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?