Brown v. Defense Commissary Agency et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Brown
Defendant: Defense Commisary Agency, Reda Moxley and Defense Commissary Agency
Case Number: 5:2022cv00349
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #5 Report and Recommendations. It is further ORDERED, after review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e), that all claims against the individual defendant, Reda Moxley, are DISMISSED. The claims against the Department of Defense will remain pending at this time. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defense Commissary Agency. USM-285, summons, order granting IFP, and copy of complaint forwarded to U.S. Marshals. (nm)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (nm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 Certified Mailing of #5 Report and Recommendations (nm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT, filed by Shannon Brown.(nm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon Brown. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (nm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Brown. (nm)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER-- re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon Brown. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff file the described supplementation, sworn as true and correct under penalty of perjury, on or before April 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (nm)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Shannon Brown. (bt)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
April 11, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
April 11, 2022 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Defense Commissary Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Commisary Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reda Moxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Commissary Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?