Couchman et al v. Callanen et al
Plaintiff: Heather Couchman, Rodney Landry, Jarrett Woodward, Jana Willborn, Matthew Stuckey, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Leigh Maddox, Marsha Landry and Heather Lynn Couchman
Defendant: Jacquelyn Callanen, Nelson Wolff, Justin Rodriguez, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Marialyn Barnard and Tommy Calvert
Case Number: 5:2022cv00929
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - 42:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nelson Wolff, Defendant Justin Rodriguez Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Cubriel, Lisa)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 16, 2022 Filing 24 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Leigh Maddox. (mgr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE Defendants' Response to Plaintiff Jarrett Woodward's Certificate of Conference RE: Record Retention and Service to #20 Advisory to the Court by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Cubriel, Lisa)
September 14, 2022 Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff, re #18 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Leigh Maddox, Plaintiff Sylvia Ann Currie, Plaintiff Matthew Stuckey, Plaintiff Madelon Highsmith, Plaintiff Jana Willborn, Plaintiff Rodney Landry, Plaintiff Jarrett Woodward, Plaintiff Marsha Landry, Plaintiff Heather Couchman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JCIT Technology Standards, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts From Paper Service Copy of Petition, #3 Proposed Order)(Piatt, Robert)
September 13, 2022 Filing 23 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Sylvia Ann Currie. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE RE: RECORD RETENTION AND SERVICE by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants' Attorneys by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nelson Wolff, Defendant Justin Rodriguez (nm)
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #4 Advisory to the Court, by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #9 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ju).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #15 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ju).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ju).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Plaintiffs may only represent themselves, not other parties, unless they are a licensed attorney admitted to practice law in this District. The parties must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and keep the Court apprised of their current mailing address, valid email address, and working telephone number. If the parties file any document jointly, they must each personally sign it unless they are represented by legal counsel. If any party fails to comply with this order, sanctions may be assessed or this action may be dismissed entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ju).
September 8, 2022 Filing 15 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (wg)
September 6, 2022 Filing 14 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Matthew Stuckey. (mgr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 13 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Rodney Landry. (mgr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Marsha Landry. (mgr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Jarrett Woodward. (mgr)
September 2, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Brief by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (nm)
September 2, 2022 Filing 9 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Sylvia Ann Currie. (nm)
September 2, 2022 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Madelon Highsmith. (nm)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff. (Cubriel, Lisa)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff. (Cubriel, Lisa)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Jana Willborn. (nm)
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff Supplemental Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1331 (Federal Question Jurisdiction). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Cubriel, Lisa)
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to #1 Notice of Removal by Heather Couchman, Sylvia Ann Currie, Madelon Highsmith, Marsha Landry, Rodney Landry, Leigh Maddox, Matthew Stuckey, Jana Willborn, Jarrett Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nm)
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Heather Couchman. (nm)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nelson Wolff, Justin Rodriguez, Tommy Calvert, Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Rebeca Clay-Flores (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-16454693), filed by Nelson Wolff, Justin Rodriguez, Tommy Calvert, Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Rebeca Clay-Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Request for Service and Process, #4 Exhibit Certificates of Service, #5 Exhibit Letters to Defendants, #6 Exhibit Notices of Hearing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Piatt, Robert)
August 26, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
August 26, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couchman et al v. Callanen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Couchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Willborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Ann Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelon Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lynn Couchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Callanen
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Wolff
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rodriguez
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebeca Clay-Flores
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marialyn Barnard
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Calvert
Represented By: Lisa V. Cubriel
Represented By: Robert William Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?